This article contains a list of presidents of the Republic of Seychelles from the time the office was established till date.
Read: NATIONAL ASSEMBLY OF SEYCHELLES
Term limits
As of 2021, there is a two-term limit for the president in the Constitution of Seychelles. The term limit has not been met by any president yet
Presidents (1976–present)
. | Name (Birth–Death) | Elected | Term of office | Political party | |||
Took office | Left office | Time in office | |||||
1 | Sir James Mancham (1939–2017) | — | 29 June 1976 | 5 June 1977 | 341 days | Seychelles Democratic Party | |
2 | France-Albert René (1934–2019) | 1979 1984 1989 1993 1998 2001 | 5 June 1977 | 14 July 2004 | 27 years, 39 days | Seychelles People’s Progressive Front | |
3 | James Michel (born 1944) | 2006 2011 2015 | 14 July 2004 | 16 October 2016 | 12 years, 94 days | Seychelles People’s Progressive Front (until 2009) | |
People’s Party | |||||||
4 | Danny Faure (born 1962) | — | 16 October 2016 | 26 October 2020 | 4 years, 10 days | People’s Party (until 2018) | |
United Seychelles | |||||||
5 | Wavel Ramkalawan (born 1959) | 2020 | 26 October 2020 | Incumbent | 2 years, 313 days | Linyon Demokratik Seselwa |